AR SB101 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB101 is now Act 874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Developmental Disabilities Services Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Developmental Disabilities Services Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB101 is now Act 874
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-05HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2019-04-05HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-04-05HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-04-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-04-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-04SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-03-04SenateRe-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-03-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-15SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-01-15SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback