AR SB101 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-09 - Notification that SB101 is now Act 41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-09SenateNotification that SB101 is now Act 41
2015-02-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-02-05SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-02-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-02-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-02-05HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2015-02-05HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-02-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-29HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2015-01-29HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-01-29SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-01-29SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-29SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-01-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-01-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2015-01-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback