AR SB1006 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1006 is now Act 1419
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create An Exemption From The Sales And Use Tax For Nonprofit Blood Donation Organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create An Exemption From The Sales And Use Tax For Nonprofit Blood Donation Organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB1006 is now Act 1419
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-19HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2013-04-12HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-12SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-12SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-11SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-11SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-10SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback