AR SB1 | 2022 | 93rd General Assembly (Special)

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 75-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-11 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Reduce Arkansas Income Taxes; To Adopt Federal Law On Depreciation And Expensing Of Property; To Create An Income-tax Credit For Certain Taxpayers; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Reduce Arkansas Income Taxes; To Adopt Federal Law On Depreciation And Expensing Of Property; To Create An Income-tax Credit For Certain Taxpayers; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors

Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R]Rep. Logan Jett [R]Rep. Matthew Shepherd [R]Rep. Lane Jean [R]
Rep. Marcus Richmond [R]Rep. Mark Berry [R]Rep. Justin Boyd [R]Rep. Joshua Bryant [R]
Rep. Joe Cloud [R]Rep. Delia Haak [R]Rep. Johnny Rye [R]Rep. Brandt Smith [R]
Rep. Brian Evans [R]Rep. Michelle Gray [R]Rep. Deann Vaught [R]Rep. Les Warren [R]
Rep. David Ray [R]Rep. Jim Wooten [R]Rep. Jon Milligan [R]Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]
Rep. Cindy Crawford [R]Rep. Les Eaves [R]Rep. David Hillman [R]Rep. Cameron Cooper [R]
Rep. Karilyn Brown [R]Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R]Rep. Lanny Fite [R]Rep. Rick McClure [R]
Rep. Jim Dotson [R]Rep. Carlton Wing [R]Rep. Bruce Coleman [R]Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R]
Rep. Steve Hollowell [R]Rep. John Maddox [R]Rep. Keith Slape [R]Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]
Rep. Keith Brooks [R]Rep. Kendon Underwood [R]Rep. Richard McGrew [R]Rep. Howard Beaty [R]
Rep. Mary Bentley [R]Rep. Nelda Speaks [R]Rep. Mark Lowery [R]Rep. Roger Lynch [R]
Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Danny Watson [R]Rep. Stu Smith [R]Rep. Harlan Breaux [R]
Rep. John Payton [R]Rep. Julie Mayberry [R]Rep. Stan Berry [R]Rep. Austin Mccollum [R]
Rep. Dwight Tosh [R]Sen. Charles Beckham [R]Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R]Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]
Sen. Jane English [R]Sen. Scott Flippo [R]Sen. Colby Fulfer [R]Sen. Ben Gilmore [R]
Sen. Blake Johnson [R]Sen. Mark Johnson [R]Sen. Kim Hammer [R]Sen. Bart Hester [R]
Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R]Sen. Ricky Hill [R]Sen. Missy Irvin [R]Sen. Matthew Pitsch [R]
Sen. Jason Rapert [R]Sen. Terry Rice [R]Sen. Bill Sample [R]Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]
Sen. James Sturch [R]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. David Wallace [R]

Roll Calls

2022-08-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-11SenateNotification that SB1 is now Act 2
2022-08-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2022-08-11SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2022-08-11SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2022-08-11SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2022-08-11HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2022-08-11HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2022-08-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2022-08-10HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2022-08-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2022-08-10HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2022-08-10SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2022-08-10SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2022-08-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2022-08-09SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2022-08-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2022-08-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback