AR SB1 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Law Concerning The State's Participation In Certain Federally Funded Unemployment Programs; To Terminate The State's Participation In Certain Federal Unemployment Programs; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Law Concerning The State's Participation In Certain Federally Funded Unemployment Programs; To Terminate The State's Participation In Certain Federal Unemployment Programs; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-06SenateNotification that SB1 is now Act 2
2021-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-08-06SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-08-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-08-06SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-08-06HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-08-06HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-08-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-08-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-08-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-08-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-08-05SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-08-05SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-08-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-08-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-08-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-08-03SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback