AR HR1068 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Declare June 2, 2019, As "pediatric Stroke Awareness Day".
Title
To Declare June 2, 2019, As "pediatric Stroke Awareness Day".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2019-04-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-02 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1068 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HR1068.pdf |