AR HR1064 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Commend And Celebrate Federally Employed Women (few) For 50 Years Of Support To Women In Federal Service.
Title
To Commend And Celebrate Federally Employed Women (few) For 50 Years Of Support To Women In Federal Service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1064 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HR1064.pdf |