AR HR1044 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorating The 60th Anniversary Of The Historic Integration Of Little Rock Central High School.
Title
Commemorating The 60th Anniversary Of The Historic Integration Of Little Rock Central High School.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Allen [D] | Rep. Charles Blake [D] | Rep. Ken Ferguson [D] | Rep. Milton Nicks [D] |
Sen. Clarke Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1044 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HR1044.pdf |