AR HR1044 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Support Increasing Diversity In Clinical Trial Participation.
Title
To Support Increasing Diversity In Clinical Trial Participation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1044 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HR1044.pdf |