AR HR1030 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Recognize And Celebrate 2019 Home School Day At The Capitol On February 26, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Recognize And Celebrate 2019 Home School Day At The Capitol On February 26, 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2019-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback