AR HR1030 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize And Celebrate 2019 Home School Day At The Capitol On February 26, 2019.
Title
To Recognize And Celebrate 2019 Home School Day At The Capitol On February 26, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2019-02-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1030 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HR1030.pdf |