AR HR1029 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming The Week Beginning May 6, 2019, As Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaiming The Week Beginning May 6, 2019, As Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2019-02-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback