AR HR1024 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Commend Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., For Its Contributions To The Community And To Designate February 27, 2023, As Alpha Kappa Alpha Day.
Title
To Commend Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., For Its Contributions To The Community And To Designate February 27, 2023, As Alpha Kappa Alpha Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2023-02-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed |