AR HR1022 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize The Positive Impact Of The Arkansas 4-h Program On Our Youth And To Celebrate 4-h Day On February 16, 2017.
Title
To Recognize The Positive Impact Of The Arkansas 4-h Program On Our Youth And To Celebrate 4-h Day On February 16, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2017-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1022 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HR1022.pdf |