AR HR1015 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulating Anna Claire Richey As A Recipient Of A Prudential Spirit Of Community Award.
Title
Congratulating Anna Claire Richey As A Recipient Of A Prudential Spirit Of Community Award.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Eubanks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2019-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1015 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HR1015.pdf |