AR HR1013 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-10)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-10)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring The 308th Titan Ii Strategic Missile Wing And The Response To The 1980 Missile Explosion At Damascus, Arkansas.
Title
Honoring The 308th Titan Ii Strategic Missile Wing And The Response To The 1980 Missile Explosion At Damascus, Arkansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1013 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HR1013.pdf |