AR HR1008 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Congratulate The Cabot School District And The Schools Within The District On Being Named Purple Star Schools.
Title
To Congratulate The Cabot School District And The Schools Within The District On Being Named Purple Star Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Evans [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed |