AR HR1003 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-20HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2014-02-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2014-02-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2014-02-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback