AR HR1001 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Adopt The Rules Of The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-fourth General Assembly.
Title
To Adopt The Rules Of The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-fourth General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-12 - House - READ AND ADOPTED. (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2023-01-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2023-01-05 | House | Filed |