AR HR1001 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Adopt The Rules Of The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-third General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Adopt The Rules Of The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-third General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-14 - House - READ AND ADOPTED. (Y: 80 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2021-01-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2021-01-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback