AR HMR1004 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Honor Clark Terry, Jr., For His Contributions To Music; And To Promote The Importance Of Musical Performance And Music Education In Arkansas.
Title
To Honor Clark Terry, Jr., For His Contributions To Music; And To Promote The Importance Of Musical Performance And Music Education In Arkansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HMR1004 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HMR1004.pdf |