AR HJR1023 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Constitution Concerning The Requirements Governing Circulation, Submission, And Challenges To The Sufficiency Of Initiatives And Constitutional Amendments Proposed By The General Assembly.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Constitution Concerning The Requirements Governing Circulation, Submission, And Challenges To The Sufficiency Of Initiatives And Constitutional Amendments Proposed By The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Eubanks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-03-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-05 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HJR1023 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HJR1023.pdf |