AR HJR1021 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution To Repeal The Exception To The Prohibition Of Slavery And Involuntary Servitude.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution To Repeal The Exception To The Prohibition Of Slavery And Involuntary Servitude.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-11 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |