AR HJR1018 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Continue A Levy Of A One-half Percent Sales And Use Tax For The State’s Highway System, County Roads, And City Streets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Continue A Levy Of A One-half Percent Sales And Use Tax For The State’s Highway System, County Roads, And City Streets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-07HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-03-07SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-03-07SenateNotice of Reconsideration withdrawn
2019-03-07SenateNotice of Reconsideration given.
2019-03-07SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-04HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-21HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback