AR HCR1018 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Express Support For Two Arkansas Universities To Play An In-state Football Game Against Each Other.
Title
To Express Support For Two Arkansas Universities To Play An In-state Football Game Against Each Other.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2021-04-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hcr1018&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HCR1018/HCR1018040620211035.pdf |