AR HCR1017 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Public Health Problem; To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat The Problem; And To Proclaim April 11, 2021, As “children’s Advocacy Center Day”.
Title
To Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Public Health Problem; To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat The Problem; And To Proclaim April 11, 2021, As “children’s Advocacy Center Day”.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-04-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-08 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-31 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hcr1017&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HCR1017/HCR1017033120211246.pdf |