AR HCR1016 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Congratulate The Magnolia High School Panthers For Their Achievements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Congratulate The Magnolia High School Panthers For Their Achievements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-04-03HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-02HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-04-02SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-04-02SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-04-01SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-01HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback