AR HCR1015 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For An Extension Of The Regular Session Of The Ninety-third General Assembly; And To Provide For An Extended Recess Of The General Assembly.
Title
To Provide For An Extension Of The Regular Session Of The Ninety-third General Assembly; And To Provide For An Extended Recess Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-03-24 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time, read the third time and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate |
2021-03-19 | House | Filed |