AR HCR1015 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Support The Study Of The Commercial Application Of Existing Technology To Reclaim And Repurpose Spent Nuclear Fuel Rods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Support The Study Of The Commercial Application Of Existing Technology To Reclaim And Repurpose Spent Nuclear Fuel Rods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-04-03HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-02HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-04-02SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-04-02SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-03-27SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-27SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-27HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-26HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-26HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-26HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-25HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
2019-03-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback