AR HCR1014 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Emphasize The Value Of Waterfowl And Waterfowl Habitat In Arkansas To The Economy, Recreation, Heritage, And Quality Of Life In The State; And To Support Efforts That Boost This Critical Part Of The State's Economy.
Title
To Emphasize The Value Of Waterfowl And Waterfowl Habitat In Arkansas To The Economy, Recreation, Heritage, And Quality Of Life In The State; And To Support Efforts That Boost This Critical Part Of The State's Economy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-04-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-18 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hcr1014&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HCR1014/HCR1014031020211250.pdf |