AR HCR1014 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Congratulate The Little Rock Christian Academy Lady Warriors For Their Achievements.
Title
To Congratulate The Little Rock Christian Academy Lady Warriors For Their Achievements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1014 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HCR1014.pdf |