AR HCR1010 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Encourage The United States Congress To Establish A Maximum Limit Of Opiate Alkaloid Contamination Of Poppy Seeds And Ensure The Safety Of Imported Poppy Seeds And To Issue Import Requirements And Conduct Testing.
Title
To Encourage The United States Congress To Establish A Maximum Limit Of Opiate Alkaloid Contamination Of Poppy Seeds And Ensure The Safety Of Imported Poppy Seeds And To Issue Import Requirements And Conduct Testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-04-15 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-14 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hcr1010&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HCR1010/HCR1010030320211246.pdf |