AR HCR1010 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Public Health Problem; To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat The Problem; And To Proclaim April 11, 2019, As “children’s Advocacy Center Day”.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Public Health Problem; To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat The Problem; And To Proclaim April 11, 2019, As “children’s Advocacy Center Day”.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-04-04HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-03HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-02HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-01SenateReturned to the House as concurred in as amended.
2019-04-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-01SenateAmendment #1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted.
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-14SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-14SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-14HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback