AR HCR1007 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 83-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Recognize January 22 As The Day Of Tears In Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Recognize January 22 As The Day Of Tears In Arkansas.

Sponsors

Rep. Jim Wooten [R]Sen. Jason Rapert [R]Rep. Deann Vaught [R]Rep. Sonia Eubanks Barker [R]
Rep. Howard Beaty [R]Rep. Rick Beck [R]Rep. Mary Bentley [R]Rep. Mark Berry [R]
Rep. Stan Berry [R]Rep. Justin Boyd [R]Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R]Rep. Harlan Breaux [R]
Rep. Keith Brooks [R]Rep. Karilyn Brown [R]Rep. Joshua Bryant [R]Rep. John Carr [R]
Rep. Frances Cavenaugh [R]Rep. Bruce Coleman [R]Rep. Cameron Cooper [R]Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]
Rep. Cindy Crawford [R]Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R]Rep. Jim Dotson [R]
Rep. Les Eaves [R]Rep. Jon Eubanks [R]Rep. Brian Evans [R]Rep. Charlene Fite [R]
Rep. Lanny Fite [R]Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R]Rep. Justin Gonzales [R]Rep. Michelle Gray [R]
Rep. Spencer Hawks [R]Rep. David Hillman [R]Rep. Mike Holcomb [R]Rep. Steve Hollowell [R]
Rep. Lane Jean [R]Rep. Lee Johnson [R]Rep. Jack Ladyman [R]Rep. Mark Lowery [R]
Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]Rep. John Maddox [R]Rep. Julie Mayberry [R]Rep. Rick McClure [R]
Rep. Austin Mccollum [R]Rep. Mark McElroy [R]Rep. Gayla McKenzie [R]Rep. Ron Mcnair [R]
Rep. Stephen Meeks [R]Rep. Josh Miller [R]Rep. John Payton [R]Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R]
Rep. David Ray [R]Rep. Marcus Richmond [R]Rep. Johnny Rye [R]Rep. Keith Slape [R]
Rep. Brandt Smith [R]Rep. Stu Smith [R]Rep. Nelda Speaks [R]Rep. Dwight Tosh [R]
Rep. Kendon Underwood [R]Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R]Rep. Les Warren [R]Rep. Danny Watson [R]
Rep. Carlton Wing [R]Rep. Richard Womack [R]Sen. Bob Ballinger [R]Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R]
Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R]Sen. Lance Eads [R]Sen. Jane English [R]
Sen. Scott Flippo [R]Sen. Trent Garner [R]Sen. Ben Gilmore [R]Sen. Kim Hammer [R]
Sen. Missy Irvin [R]Sen. Blake Johnson [R]Sen. Terry Rice [R]Sen. Bill Sample [R]
Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. David Wallace [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-04-15HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-14HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-14HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2021-04-14SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2021-04-14SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2021-04-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-01-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-21SenateReceived from the House.
2021-01-21HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-01-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
2021-01-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback