AR HCR1006 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Encourage The President, Congress, And Arkansas Congressional Delegation To Work To Restore Trade Relations Between The United States And Cuba.
Title
To Encourage The President, Congress, And Arkansas Congressional Delegation To Work To Restore Trade Relations Between The United States And Cuba.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hillman [R] | Sen. Eddie Williams [R] | Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R] | Rep. Dan Douglas [R] |
Sen. Bruce Maloch [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-03 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2015-03-03 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed |