AR HCR1006 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Commending The North Little Rock High School Boys Basketball Team For Winning The 7a State Championship And The 7a/6a East Conference Championship.
Title
Commending The North Little Rock High School Boys Basketball Team For Winning The 7a State Championship And The 7a/6a East Conference Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Armstrong [D] | Sen. Linda Chesterfield [D] | Rep. Douglas House [R] | Sen. Jane English [R] |
Rep. Patti Julian [D] | Rep. Jim Nickels [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-01 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1006 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HCR1006.pdf |