AR HCR1005 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Commend The Bentonville High School Wind Ensemble.
Title
To Commend The Bentonville High School Wind Ensemble.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-03-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-04 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-02-27 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-20 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as concurred in, as amended #1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The concurrence vote on 2-18-2019 was expunged |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Motion to Expunge |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2019-02-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-18 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-13 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1005 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HCR1005.pdf |