AR HCR1004 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Congratulate The Little Rock Christian Academy Warriors Football Team On Winning The 2018 Class 5a State Championship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Congratulate The Little Rock Christian Academy Warriors Football Team On Winning The 2018 Class 5a State Championship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-20HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-20HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-02-20SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-02-20SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-02-18SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-02-18SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-18HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-31HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-31HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-01-31HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-01-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback