AR HCR1004 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law.
Title
To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | House Approved by the Governor | |
2012-02-23 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2012-02-23 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2012-02-23 | House Returned From Senate concurred in. | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Returned To the House as concurred in. | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Resolution read and concurred in. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2012-02-22 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2012-02-14 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES | |
2012-01-26 | House Prefiled |