AR HCR1003 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Reviewed and Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Encourage Continued Collaboration Among Healthcare Providers, Law Enforcement, Educators, Public Officials, And The Arkansas Community In Battling The Abuse Of Prescription Drugs In Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Encourage Continued Collaboration Among Healthcare Providers, Law Enforcement, Educators, Public Officials, And The Arkansas Community In Battling The Abuse Of Prescription Drugs In Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseReviewed and Approved by the Governor
2019-02-18HouseReviewed by the Governor
2019-02-14HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-14HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-14HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-02-14SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-02-14SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-07SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-07HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-04HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-04HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-30HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-30HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-01-30HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-29HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2019-01-28HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-01-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-15HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback