AR HCR1002 | 2022 | 93rd General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-16)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-16)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Joint Rules Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly.
Title
To Amend The Joint Rules Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2022-03-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2022-03-08 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to SENATE RULES, RESOLUTIONS & MEMORIALS |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2022-03-02 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2022-02-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2022-02-28 | House | Filed |