AR HCR1002 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing National Ffa Week.
Title
Recognizing National Ffa Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-22 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-21 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-21 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-21 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-21 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-02-17 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-02-17 | House Filed |