AR HCR1001 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
For A Virtual Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate At 10:30 A.m., Tuesday, January 12, 2021, To Declare Election Results And To Hear An Address By The Governor.
Title
For A Virtual Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate At 10:30 A.m., Tuesday, January 12, 2021, To Declare Election Results And To Hear An Address By The Governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-01-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-01-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-01-11 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read and adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended. Read the second time, rules suspended. Read the third time. |
2021-01-08 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hcr1001&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HCR1001/HCR1001010820211709.pdf |