AR HCR1001 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate At 10:30 A.m., Tuesday, January 15, 2019, To Declare Election Results, To Administer The Oath Of Office, And To Hear An Address By The Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate At 10:30 A.m., Tuesday, January 15, 2019, To Declare Election Results, To Administer The Oath Of Office, And To Hear An Address By The Governor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-18HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-01-15HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-01-15HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-01-15HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-01-15SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-01-15SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-01-14SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-01-14SenateReceived from the House.
2019-01-14HouseRead and adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended. Read the second time, rules suspended. Read the third time.
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback