AR HCR1001 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly 2nd Special

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-08 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate In The House Chamber At 10:30 A.m. On Wednesday, April 6, 2016, For The Purpose Of Hearing An Address By The Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate In The House Chamber At 10:30 A.m. On Wednesday, April 6, 2016, For The Purpose Of Hearing An Address By The Governor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-08HouseApproved by the Governor
2016-04-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-04-06HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-04-06HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2016-04-06SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2016-04-06SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2016-04-06SenateRules suspended.
2016-04-06SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2016-04-06SenateReceived from the House.
2016-04-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time, Rules suspended, read the third time, read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-04-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback