AR HCR1001 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing An Amendment To The Joint Rules Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Eighty-ninth General Assembly.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The Joint Rules Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Eighty-ninth General Assembly.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Lea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | House | Approved by the Governor. |
2014-02-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2014-02-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2014-02-26 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Rules, Resolutions and Memorials |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2014-02-13 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2014-02-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2014F/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCR1001 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2014F/Bills/HCR1001.pdf |