AR HCMR1001 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Honor The Memory Of Deputy Sonny Smith.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Honor The Memory Of Deputy Sonny Smith.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-29HouseApproved by the Governor
2015-05-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-05-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-05-28HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2015-05-28SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2015-05-28SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2015-05-27SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2015-05-27SenateReceived from the House.
2015-05-27HouseResolution received unanimous support.
2015-05-27HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-05-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-05-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT
2015-05-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback