AR HB2283 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2283 is now Act 1514
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow Law Enforcement Officers To Use An Alternative Or Secondary Address To Receive Letters And Communications From State Agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow Law Enforcement Officers To Use An Alternative Or Secondary Address To Receive Letters And Communications From State Agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23HouseNotification that HB2283 is now Act 1514
2013-04-18HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-17HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-17HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2013-04-17HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-04-17SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-17SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-17SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-17SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-16SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2013-03-25SenateReceived from the House.
2013-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-21HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-03-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2013-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback