AR HB2277 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Law Regarding The Scope Of Small Brewery Operations; To Allow Transportation Of In-house Products Between Commonly Owned Small Breweries And Breweries That Own Small Breweries; To Create Small Brewery Tap Rooms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Law Regarding The Scope Of Small Brewery Operations; To Allow Transportation Of In-house Products Between Commonly Owned Small Breweries And Breweries That Own Small Breweries; To Create Small Brewery Tap Rooms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2017-03-15HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-07HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback