AR HB2267 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2267 is now Act 1512
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Provisions Of Arkansas Law Concerning The Visitation Rights Of Grandparents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Provisions Of Arkansas Law Concerning The Visitation Rights Of Grandparents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23HouseNotification that HB2267 is now Act 1512
2013-04-18HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-17HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-17HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2013-04-17SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2013-04-17SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-12SenateReceived from the House.
2013-04-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-11HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-11HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-11HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-10HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-03-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2013-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback